skip to content

Al-Hellawi, Ali Zedan Degan

CPSO#: 85757

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
1448 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4A 2V6
Phone: (647) 344-5990
Fax: (647) 343-6002 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI ZEDAN DEGAN AL-HELLAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HELLAWI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 29, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 14, 2019, Dr. Ali Zedan Degan Al-Hellawi has completed all components of his SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)