AlHarbi, Khalid Hamed (CPSO#: 99612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 17 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID HAMED ALHARBI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALHARBI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALHARBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHARBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALHARBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALHARBI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALHARBI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2012 to 03 Dec 2012
PEAP - Resident - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Dec 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 06 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2013 to 13 Aug 2013
PEAP - Resident - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Aug 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PEAP - Resident - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019