skip to content

AlGhamdi, Samirah Ali Saeed

CPSO#: 85763

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 16 Nov 2006 to 29 Nov 2006
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 30 Nov 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2009 to 05 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 06 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011