skip to content

AlGarni, Saleh Ahmad Saleh

CPSO#: 96645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 11 Aug 2012
CF - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurology

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019