skip to content

Al-Faraj, Malikah Abdulmajeed Hassan

CPSO#: 88716

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Sep 2008
PEAP - R - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 13 Sep 2008 to 12 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 13 Sep 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010