Al-Dabbagh, Raed (CPSO#: 98378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health Liver Care
96 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R2Z3
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 905-704-0347
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raed Al-Dabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Al-Dabbagh ( CPSO# 98378 )

Business Address:
96 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z3
Phone Number: (905) 684-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAED AL-DABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-DABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016