skip to content

Al-Bazzaz, Saba Ameen Mohamed Saleh

CPSO#: 99345

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 13 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 14 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2014