skip to content

AlBaqami, Mohammad Faraj Al-Rajhi

CPSO#: 88139

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Mar 2008 to 24 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2010