skip to content

Al-Baldawi, Danya

CPSO#: 97570

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara North Family Health Team
9-605 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 4E6
Phone: 905.685.8700
Fax: 905.988.1616 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Linhaven Nursing Home
403 Ontario St
St Catharines ON  L2N 4M8
Phone: (905) 934-3364
Fax: 905-934-6975
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Danya Al-Baldawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Al-Baldawi ( CPSO# 97570 )

Business Address:
9-605 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 4E6

Business Address:
403 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Phone Number: (905) 934-3364

Business Address:
283 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X7
Phone Number: (905) 688-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANYA AL-BALDAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-BALDAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014