skip to content

Al-Azem, Hafsah

CPSO#: 96165

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Oct 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Ottawa Specialty Care, Suite 1
770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: 613-680-9092
Fax: 613-680-9093 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Arthritis Centre
The Ottawa Hospital
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: 613-738-8400 Ext. 81840
Fax: 613-738-8336
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

350 John St N
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAFSAH AL-AZEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AZEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017