skip to content

AlAwamy, Mohammed Baker H

CPSO#: 86053

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
EXPIRY DATE
04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Baker H. AlAwamy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
EL - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
EL - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020