skip to content

Al-Attar, Salam Akram Ali

CPSO#: 97865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800-89 Queensway W

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Dusk Dr #1
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Canada
Phone: 905-451-9999
Fax: 905-456-8998
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

250 Dundas St W
County: 
Electoral District: 

150 Sherway Dr
County: 
Electoral District: 

2200 Eglinton Ave W
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Salam A. Al-Attar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Attar ( CPSO# 97865 )

Business Address:
8-51 Mountainash Road
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Business Address:
11755 Bramlea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3S9

Business Address:
Suite 1
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6

Business Address:
Suite 110 - 111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3

Business Address:
Suite 2
4000 Highway No. 7
Mississauga ON  L4L 8Z2

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4

Business Address:
Suite 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SALAM AKRAM ALI AL-ATTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ATTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015