skip to content

Al-Attar, Hyder Majed

CPSO#: 93055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 78571
Fax: 613-7378830 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hyder Al-Attar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Attar ( CPSO# 93055 )

Business Address:
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L6

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6

Business Address:
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6

Business Address:
Suite 502
751 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J7

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HYDER MAJED AL-ATTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ATTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015