skip to content

Al-Assaf, Niazy Elia

CPSO#: 99868

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Damascus, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Syria

United Kingdom

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 18 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2015