skip to content

Al-Asiri, Jamal Ali Naser

CPSO#: 88239

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
5N 533 - 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44549
Fax: 905-296-5199 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Al-Asiri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Al-Asiri ( CPSO# 88239 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
5N Room 533
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMAL ALI NASER AL-ASIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ASIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 24 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2019