skip to content

Al-Asaaed, Sohaib

CPSO#: 88316

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2008 to 21 Sep 2008
EL - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013