skip to content

AlAsaad, Hani Ghalib Mohammed

CPSO#: 99306

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 - 370 Bayview Dr
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: 705 7370830
Fax: 705 7370679 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alasaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANI GHALIB MOHAMMED ALASAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALASAAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015