skip to content

Al-Arnawoot, Basma Salah Abdul Qadir

CPSO#: 97821

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 46521 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Basma Salah Abdul Qadir Al-Arnawoot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al-Arnawoot ( CPSO# 97821 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASMA SALAH ABDUL QADIR AL-ARNAWOOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ARNAWOOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 10 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2017