skip to content

Al-Amodi, Hussein Abdullah Omar

CPSO#: 96744

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
29 Feb 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hadhramout Univ of Science & Technology, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - University Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:01 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 19 Sep 2011 to 12 Jan 2012
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 13 Jan 2012 to 12 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 13 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 04 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 04 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 29 Feb 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2021 Active
 1. Dr. HUSSEIN ABDULLAH OMAR AL-AMODI may practise cardiac surgery at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital in London, Ontario; and

(ii) London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital in London, Ontario. 

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. AL-AMODI's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. AL-AMODI's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2021, and will expire on or before 29 February, 2024, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.