skip to content

Al-Agha, Rany Bassam

CPSO#: 91552

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10240 Kingsway NW
Edmonton AB  T5H 3V9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2021 Active
 Dr. RANY BASSAM AL-AGHA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, only.