skip to content

AlAdhadh, Ameen Mohammad H

CPSO#: 99781

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Jan 2013 to 19 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 2014