skip to content

Al-Adba, Buthaina Saoud Saadoun

CPSO#: 99698

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 17 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2015