Al-Abri, Mahmood Shaikhan Abdullah (CPSO#: 99916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOOD SHAIKHAN ABDULLAH AL-ABRI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-ABRI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-ABRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-ABRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-ABRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-ABRI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-ABRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 02 May 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2018 to 11 Feb 2018
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018