skip to content

Al-Abdwani, Raghad Mohamed Redha Hassan

CPSO#: 88278

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2011 to 25 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015