skip to content

Al Zayed, Mohammad Y S E

CPSO#: 86096

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 31 May 2007
PEAP - R - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011