skip to content

Al Zahrani, Ahmad Mohammed A

CPSO#: 89694

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010