skip to content

Al Sawi, Mohamed Ali Mahmoud

CPSO#: 84910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Scarborough Health Network
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al Sawi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al Sawi ( CPSO# 84910 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Ave E,
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Business Address:
9 Butternut Lane
Markham ON  L3P 3M1
Phone Number: (905) 294-0944

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ALI MAHMOUD AL SAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2021