skip to content

Al Sabbagh, Reem

CPSO#: 96365

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 112-113
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-6733
Fax: (905) 636-9388 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Al Sabbagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khalefih ( CPSO# 85228 )
Dr. R. Al Sabbagh ( CPSO# 96365 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2

Business Address:
330 Bronte Street South
Units 112
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 693-6733

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REEM AL SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SABBAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013