skip to content

Al Nasser, Yasser Ahmad H

CPSO#: 92728

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: (647) 689-2371 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Al Nasser ( CPSO# 92728 )

Business Address:
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASSER AHMAD H AL NASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL NASSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 17 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2017