skip to content

Al Nashmi, Tofol Ahmed Musa

CPSO#: 93854

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
EL - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 02 Nov 2011
EL - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014