skip to content

Al Mutawa, Fatimah Hussain

CPSO#: 92675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 c0mmissioner Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC Victoria Hospital
Pathology and Laboratory Medicine
Division Microbiology
800 Commissioners Road E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 5196858500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Almutawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Al Mutawa ( CPSO# 92675 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FATIMAH HUSSAIN AL MUTAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL MUTAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 17 May 2010 to 23 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019