Al Mashaykhi, Nawal Hamed Mohamed (CPSO#: 101297)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016