skip to content

Al Mansoori, Taleb Mohamed Ebrahim M S Al Mansoor

CPSO#: 85862

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2007 to 26 Mar 2007
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2007 to 13 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PEAP - R - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017