skip to content

Al Jurfi, Ismail Jaber Ahmed

CPSO#: 87672

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2011