skip to content

Al Jughiman, Mohammed Khaled A

CPSO#: 95024

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 25 Oct 2017
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018