skip to content

Al Hindi, Taghreed Talal Mahmood

CPSO#: 92653

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Apr 2010 to 12 Jul 2010
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2010 to 12 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2017