skip to content

Al Hatlani, Maher Mohammed S

CPSO#: 86081

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 07 Jun 2007
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 08 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010