Al Hasni, Alya Ali Abdullah (CPSO#: 99685)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 08 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2013 to 17 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2013 to 06 May 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014