skip to content

Al Harbi, Qasim Kholaif Saqor

CPSO#: 88113

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 20 Jun 2008
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 21 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Feb 2011