skip to content

Al Ghanim, Nayef Saleh A

CPSO#: 94256

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nayef Al Ghanim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2014