skip to content

Al Faris, Jamila Ali Hassan

CPSO#: 89758

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 19 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 23 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2008 to 23 Nov 2009
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2009 to 23 Nov 2010
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2012