skip to content

Al Enazi, Meteb Hamed K

CPSO#: 86063

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sleep and Alertness Clinic
790 BAY STREET
Suite 800
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 603-5075 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. METEB HAMED K AL ENAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL ENAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015