skip to content

Al Bin Mousa, Zakariya Hussain Ali

CPSO#: 99885

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dammam, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2013 to 26 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016