skip to content

Akula, Hari Priya

CPSO#: 86910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gulbarga University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Valley Medical Clinic
21 Main Street North
Grand Valley ON  L9W 5S6
Phone: (519) 928-5666
Fax: (519) 928-3260 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

140 ROLLING HILLS DR.
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-7575
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Akula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akula ( CPSO# 86910 )

Business Address:
Grand Valley Medical Clinic
21 Main Street North
Grand Valley ON  L9W 5S6
Phone Number: (519) 928-5666

Business Address:
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 928-5666

Business Address:
L-1 - 1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARI PRIYA AKULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010