skip to content

Akter, Parvin

CPSO#: 98516

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Dhaka, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 Springbank Drive
Suit- 203
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 657-0550
Fax: (519) 913-0706 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

SJHC - PARKWOOD HOSPITAL
801 Commissioners Road
N6C5J1
County of Middlesex
London ON  N6C5J1
Canada
Phone: 519-685-4000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Akter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Akter ( CPSO# 98516 )

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
Suite 203
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 657-0550


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Bangladesh

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARVIN AKTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2015