skip to content

Aksoy, Tuba

CPSO#: 95522

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8760 Jane St
Suite 204A
Concord ON  L4K4V3
Phone: 9058894040
Fax: 9058894848 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tuba Aksoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Aksoy ( CPSO# 95522 )

Business Address:
26 - 8707 Dufferin Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 889-4040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TUBA AKSOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKSOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017