skip to content

Akladios, Hala Nazmy

CPSO#: 92254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-726 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton ON  L8V 4K1
Phone: 905-481-3242
Fax: 365-317-8029 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hala N. Akladios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akladios ( CPSO# 92254 )

Business Address:
2 - 726 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 575-0777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HALA NAZMY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 15 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012