skip to content

Akinsooto, Victor Shola

CPSO#: 88164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ilorin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
4271 King St East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone: (519) 650-0011
Fax: (519) 650-0033 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: V.S. Akinsooto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7


Corporation Name: Akinsooto, Amin, Faghih and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (519) 650-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:27 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR SHOLA AKINSOOTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINSOOTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2008