skip to content

Akinremi, Omolayomi Oluwafunmilola

CPSO#: 95808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3530 Derry Road East
Unit 110-111
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 672-2273
Fax: (416) 750-1500 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Mountainash Road
Springdale Square, Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 750-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4000 Highway #7
Unit 2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 851-3777
Fax: (416) 750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: (905) 212-1433
Fax: (416) 750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Omolayomi Akinremi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akinremi ( CPSO# 95808 )

Business Address:
Springdale Square
51 Mountainash Road
Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Unit 10
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 741-2273

Business Address:
3530 Derry Road East
Units 110-111
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone Number: (905) 672-2273

Business Address:
4000 Highway #7
Unit 2
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Phone Number: (905) 851-3777

Business Address:
1500 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (905) 212-1433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OMOLAYOMI OLUWAFUNMILOLA AKINREMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINREMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013