skip to content

Akhtari, Shahrzad

CPSO#: 87559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shaheed Sadooghi University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alvand Medical Centre
Unit C 20 & C21
50 Dr Kay Dr
Schomberg ON  L0G 1T0
Phone: 905-939-9111
Fax: 905-939-2111 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shahrzad Akhtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtari ( CPSO# 87559 )

Business Address:
Alvand Medical Centre
50 Dr. Kay Drive
Unit C20
Schomberg ON  L0G 1T0
Phone Number: (905) 939-9111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHRZAD AKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009